Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830167

EP2830167 - Connector fixing structure and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY LIMITED
21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0043 / JP
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Tada, Takashi
c/o Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Limited
21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo, 150-0043 / JP
02 / Matsunaga, Akihiro
c/o Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Limited
21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo, 150-0043 / JP
03 / Nishikata, Masayuki
c/o Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Limited
21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo, 150-0043 / JP
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date14170694.530.05.2014
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateJP2013015363924.07.2013         Original published format: JP 2013153639
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830167
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2830167
Date:07.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/74, H01R13/52
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/41]
Former [2015/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Steckerverbinderbefestigungsstruktur und Herstellungsverfahren dafür[2015/40]
English:Connector fixing structure and method of manufacturing the same[2015/05]
French:Structure de fixation de connecteur et son procédé de fabrication[2015/20]
Former [2015/05]Steckerverbinderbefestigungsstruktur und Herstellungsverfahren dafür
Former [2015/05]Structure de fixation de connecteur et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure30.05.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
10.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2015Fee for grant paid
25.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)08.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.05.2014
AL07.10.2015
AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
TR07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE30.05.2016
LU30.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU30.05.2014
AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
TR07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE30.05.2016
LU30.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
Former [2018/38]HU30.05.2014
AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE30.05.2016
LU30.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
Former [2018/32]HU30.05.2014
AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE30.05.2016
LU30.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
Former [2018/30]HU30.05.2014
AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE30.05.2016
LU30.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
Former [2017/26]AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE30.05.2016
LU30.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
Former [2017/04]AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
LU30.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/34]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/25]AT07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/23]ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/22]ES07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/21]ES07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
Former [2016/20]ES07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2226185  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0024] - [0025]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5041019  (SHARP WILLIAM F [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2011056731  (VANDENEYNDEN BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0032]; figures 5-7 *
by applicantJP5155492B