Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811048

EP2811048 - Coating process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, New York 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MARGOLIES, Joshua Lee
One River Road
Schenectady, NY New York 12345 / US
02 / GROSSMAN, Theodore Robert
One Neumann Way
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Bedford, Grant Richard
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date14170731.502.06.2014
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateUS20131391029005.06.2013         Original published format: US201313910290
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811048
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:C23C4/02, C23C4/10, C23C4/18, F01D5/28, C23C24/08
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Former [2014/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Beschichtungsverfahren[2014/50]
English:Coating process[2014/50]
French:Procédé de revêtement[2014/50]
Examination procedure29.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
26.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4135326  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-13,15 * the whole document * [A] 5,8,9,14;
 [X]US4851188  (SCHAEFER ROBERT P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10,14,15 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US6221175  (KURZ WILFRIED [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,10,15 * column 3, line 21 - line 45; figures 1, 2; claims 1-11 * [A] 7-9,11-14;
 [X]CH674650  (CASTOLIN SA) [X] 1-5,10,13,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH09170061  (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,13,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP2522452  (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,10,14,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19940458  (NANOGATE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,15 * claims 1-24 *;
 [X]US6153270  (RUSSMANN HORST [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * the whole document *