Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813769

EP2813769 - Air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Hankook
391-2 Gaeunmjung-dong, Changwon-si
641-110 Kyungsangnam-do / KR
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2016/05]
Former [2014/51]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14170738.002.06.2014
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateKR2013006856414.06.2013         Original published format: KR 20130068564
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813769
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813769
Date:03.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:F24F1/00, F24F13/20
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Klimaanlage[2014/51]
English:Air conditioner[2014/51]
French:Climatiseur[2014/51]
Examination procedure25.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
13.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2015Fee for grant paid
15.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.11.2015Information about intention to grant a patent
23.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)04.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.06.2014
AL03.02.2016
AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CY03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
MK03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
TR03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IE02.06.2016
LU02.06.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU02.06.2014
AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CY03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
MK03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
TR03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IE02.06.2016
LU02.06.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/32]HU02.06.2014
AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CY03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
MK03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IE02.06.2016
LU02.06.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/30]HU02.06.2014
AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CY03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
MK03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IE02.06.2016
LU02.06.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2017/38]AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IE02.06.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2017/16]AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2017/07]AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2017/03]AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/50]AT03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/49]AT03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/46]AT03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
Former [2016/35]FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1686325  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007074952  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]; KIM JEONG HUN [KR]; SONG HYE YOUNG [KR]; KIM) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantKR20070078261