Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814305

EP2814305 - Heat-transfer plate, heat-transfer plate module, and submarine apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshizumi, Takahisa
FUJITSU KYUSHU NETWORK TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED
2-2-1, Momochihama
Sawara-ku, Fukuoka-shi
Fukuoka, 814-8588 / JP
02 / Hoshiyama, Naoto
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date14170755.402.06.2014
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateJP2013012375412.06.2013         Original published format: JP 2013123754
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2814305
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2814305
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2814305
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20, // G02B6/44, G02B6/50, H05K3/28, H05K3/00
[2017/16]
Former International [2015/19]H05K7/20, // G02B6/44, H05K3/28, H05K3/00
Former International [2014/51]H05K1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/40]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wärmeleitplatte, Wärmeleitplattenmodul und Unterwasservorrichtung[2014/51]
English:Heat-transfer plate, heat-transfer plate module, and submarine apparatus[2014/51]
French:Plaque de transfert de chaleur, module de plaque de transfert thermique et appareil sous-marin[2014/51]
Examination procedure20.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/40]
28.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2017Fee for grant paid
28.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)11.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
[2019/15]
Former [2018/39]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004070946  (MATSUO MITSUHIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0079] , [0085] , [0092]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2003161111  (YOSHIDA RYUJI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0034] - [0046]; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US2009059498  (JEONG JEO WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0062] - [0065]; figure 2 *;
 [A]JPH08111568  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,7,8 * paragraph [0027]; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US2005036751  (YOUNG MARK K [US] ET AL) [A] 1,7,8
by applicantJP2001144449
 JP2004222426