Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2814305 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2814305



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 217
13.06.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.08.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.07.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.06.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.06.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
28.06.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.06.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.03.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
31.03.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
31.03.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 42
14.03.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
28.08.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
28.08.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.08.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
28.08.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
20.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.05.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.04.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.04.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 2
10.04.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
07.04.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
31.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
09.09.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
02.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.06.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
02.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
02.06.2014 Description Search / examination 18
02.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 19
02.06.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5