Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2814305


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
15.06.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
07.07.2017 (Expected) grant published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
06.07.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.07.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.07.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.03.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.03.2017 Change - classification published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2015 Amendment by applicant
28.08.2015 Change - designated states published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
28.08.2015 Change - request for examination published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
05.04.2015 Publication of search report published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
05.04.2015 Change - classification published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
17.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]