Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784556

EP2784556 - Backlight assembly and display apparatus having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
17113, 1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
[2015/40]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
95, Samsung 2 Ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-City
Gyeonggi-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Chung, Seung-Hwan
Tangjeong Samsung Trapalace
Myeong-am-ri
Tangjeong-myeon, Asan-si
304-2603 Chungcheongnam-do / KR
02 / Noh, Cheol-Yong
ugong Greenville 11 Danji 1 Cha Apt.
Baekseok-dong, Seobuk-gu
Cheonan-si
104-1003 Chungcheongnam-do / KR
03 / Jeong, Kwang-Jin
Hyundai Hometown I-Park Apt.
Ssangyong-dong
Seobuk-gu, Cheonan-si
Chungcheongnam-do / KR
04 / Kang, Eui Jeong
Hando Apt., Baebang-myeon
Asan-si
101-1404 Chungcheongnam-do / KR
05 / Han, Youn-Ho
Samsung Crystal Dormitory
Tangjeong-myeon
Asan-si
Cubic-405 Chungcheongnam-do / KR
06 / Yoo, Jae-Suk
Woosung 4 Cha Apt.
Dogok 2-dong, Gangnam-gu
7-403 Seoul / KR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date14170860.229.03.2012
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateKR2011008126816.08.2011         Original published format: KR 20110081268
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784556
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784556
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/00, G02F1/1335
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rückbeleuchtungsanordnung und damit versehene Anzeigevorrichtung[2014/40]
English:Backlight assembly and display apparatus having the same[2014/40]
French:Ensemble de rétroéclairage et appareil d'affichage doté de celui-ci[2014/40]
Examination procedure12.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/17]
31.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2016Fee for grant paid
16.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12161978.7  / EP2560035
Opposition(s)29.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.03.2012
AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IE29.03.2017
LU29.03.2017
MT29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IE29.03.2017
LU29.03.2017
MT29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IE29.03.2017
LU29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
LU29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/42]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV28.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010060818  (AJICHI YUHSAKU [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,15,17-20 * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0117]; figures 8,9,10 * [I] 2-7,16;
 [XI]EP2241800  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0107]; figures 9,10 * [I] 8-14;
 [A]EP2312660  (SAMSUNG LED CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0411] - paragraph [0420]; figure 35 *