Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2784556 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2784556



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 275
03.11.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.12.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.12.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.11.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.11.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
16.11.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.07.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.07.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.07.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.07.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 50
29.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
29.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
29.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.02.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.11.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.11.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.10.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
31.08.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
31.08.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
20.08.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
17.08.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 11
31.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
31.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
31.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
31.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.03.2015 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
17.12.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
25.11.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.09.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
10.09.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
03.09.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
25.08.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
03.06.2014 Description Search / examination 36
03.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 9
03.06.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
31.05.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 68