Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2784556


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
03.11.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
14.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
09.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
25.11.2016 (Expected) grant published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
18.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.07.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.03.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.11.2015 First examination report
28.08.2015 Change - applicant published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
01.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
26.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2015 Change - designated states published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Change - request for examination published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
01.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
07.06.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid