Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2784556 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201210157593 EP12161978 EP14170860



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2784556Global Dossier 28.12.2016B1
EP2784556 01.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20110081268 16.08.2011
EP12161978 29.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9217894Global Dossier 22.12.2015B2
US2013044509 21.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
KR20110081268 16.08.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101767973BGlobal Dossier 16.08.2017B1
KR20130019231 26.02.2013A
Priority number Date
KR20110081268 16.08.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2013041817Global Dossier 28.02.2013A
Priority number Date
KR20110081268 16.08.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2560035Global Dossier 16.07.2014B1
EP2560035 10.04.2013A3
EP2560035 20.02.2013A2
Priority number Date
KR20110081268 16.08.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN102954400BGlobal Dossier 14.12.2016B
CN102954400 06.03.2013A
Priority number Date
KR20110081268 16.08.2011
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2560035