Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813335

EP2813335 - System and method for producing a three-dimensional dry fiber preform [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Thrash, Patrick J.
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
MC H017-D625
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
02 / Boger, Chad L.
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
MC H45N-E103
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
03 / Farrell, Michael James
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
MC H45N-E103
Chicago, Illinois 60606-2016 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14170885.903.06.2014
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateUS20131391085705.06.2013         Original published format: US201313910857
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813335
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813335
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:B29B11/16
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Erzeugung einer dreidimensionalen Trockenfaservorform[2014/51]
English:System and method for producing a three-dimensional dry fiber preform[2014/51]
French:Système et procédé de production d'une préforme de fibre sèche en trois dimensions[2014/51]
Examination procedure03.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
16.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2015Fee for grant paid
16.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)12.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.06.2014
AL09.12.2015
AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
BG09.12.2015
CY09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
HR09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
MK09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
TR09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
IE03.06.2016
LU03.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU03.06.2014
AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
BG09.12.2015
CY09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
HR09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
MK09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
TR09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
IE03.06.2016
LU03.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/38]HU03.06.2014
AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
BG09.12.2015
CY09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
HR09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
MK09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
IE03.06.2016
LU03.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/32]HU03.06.2014
AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
CY09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
HR09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
MK09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
IE03.06.2016
LU03.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/30]HU03.06.2014
AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
CY09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
HR09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
MK09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
IE03.06.2016
LU03.06.2016
Former [2017/38]AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
IE03.06.2016
Former [2017/07]AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
Former [2017/03]AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
Former [2016/49]AT09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
Former [2016/46]AT09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IS09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IS09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/31]FI09.12.2015
IS09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/26]FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/23]LT09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT09.12.2015
NO09.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT09.12.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102008057782  (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0009] , [0010] , [0012] , [0019] , [0021] , [0023] , [0037] , [0040] , [0042] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO0242044  (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]; DLR EV [DE]; KOERWIEN THOMAS [DE]; BAUER E) [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 7 - page 8 * * page 18 - page 20 *;
 [AD]US8042767  (VELICKI ALEXANDER [US] ET AL) [AD] 1-15 * figure 3A *
by applicantUS8042767