Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818417

EP2818417 - Aircraft comparison system with synchronized displays [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2017/05]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Senesac, Christopher J
5400 International Boulevard MC 7830-SE32
North Charleston, SC 29418 / US
02 / Peterson, Shane T.
c/o The Boing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
 [2017/05]
Former [2015/01]01 / Senesac, Christopher J
5400 International Boulevard MC 7830-SE32
North Charleston, SC South Carolina 29418 / US
02 / Peterson, Shane T.
c/o The Boing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Representative(s)Thorniley, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Thorniley, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14170988.103.06.2014
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateUS20131392241120.06.2013         Original published format: US201313922411
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818417
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2818417
Date:01.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:B64F5/00
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:Flugzeugvergleichssystem mit synchronisierten Anzeigen[2015/01]
English:Aircraft comparison system with synchronized displays[2015/01]
French:Système de comparaison d'aéronef avec des affichages synchronisés[2015/01]
Examination procedure03.06.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
22.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2016Fee for grant paid
20.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.06.2014
AT01.02.2017
CY01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
IE03.06.2017
LU03.06.2017
MT03.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU03.06.2014
AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
IE03.06.2017
LU03.06.2017
MT03.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
IE03.06.2017
LU03.06.2017
MT03.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/39]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
IE03.06.2017
LU03.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/23]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
IE03.06.2017
LU03.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/21]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
LU03.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/11]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2790136  (BOEING CO [US]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0178]; figures 8-19 * * paragraph [0209] - paragraph [0226]; figures 26a, 26b * * paragraphs [0004] , [0189] *;
 [A]WO0049544  (AUTOBYTEL COM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 22, line 66 - column 23, line 27; figure 14 *