Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814292

EP2814292 - Method and device for dynamic control of RF power emissions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Steer, David G.
10 Cypress Crt.
Nepean, Ontario K2H 8Z8 / CA
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/19]
Former [2014/51]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14171042.603.06.2014
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateUS20131391697313.06.2013         Original published format: US201313916973
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814292
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2814292
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/18, H04W52/28, H04W52/14, H04W52/36
[2018/52]
Former International [2014/51]H04W52/28, H04W52/36, H04W52/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur dynamischen Steuerung der RF-Sendeleistung[2014/51]
English:Method and device for dynamic control of RF power emissions[2014/51]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la régulation dynamique de la puissance RF d'emission[2014/51]
Examination procedure16.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
17.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.11.2018
06.11.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2019Fee for grant paid
27.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
[2019/47]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012122116  (QUALCOMM INC [US]; NGAI FRANCIS M [US]; FORRESTER JOHN A [US]; VAIDYAN) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0070] - [0078] - [0087] - [0088] - [0092] , [0107] , [0112] - [0114] - [0117] , [0126] , [0128] *;
 [X]US2012190398  (LEUKKUNEN MARKO J [FI]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0029] - [0030] - [0035] , [0039] - [0044] - [0053] , [0055] - [0056] *;
 [X]EP1298809  (SIEMENS INF & COMM MOBILE LLC [US] SIEMENS COMM INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0005] - [0008] , [0020] - [0022] - [0026] , [0030] - [0033] - [0038] - [0039] - [0 41] - [0043] *
ExaminationUS2013065525
 US2002016155