Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811123

EP2811123 - Apparatus for pivoting an upper portion of a turbine shell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.11.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.12.2015  [2015/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, New York 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hynous, Andrew Thomas
300 Garlington Road
Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US
02 / Graham, Gerald Robert
210 Fowler Lane
Greenville, SC South Carolina 29607 / US
03 / Poston, Larry Alan
337 Georges Creek Drive
Easley, SC South Carolina 29640 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth , et al
Global Patent Operations Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth , et al
Global Patent Operation - Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date14171154.904.06.2014
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateUS20131390912404.06.2013         Original published format: US201313909124
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811123
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:F01D25/28, B65G47/248
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Kippen eines oberen Teils eines Turbinengehäuses[2014/50]
English:Apparatus for pivoting an upper portion of a turbine shell[2014/50]
French:Appareil pour pivoter une portion supérieure d'un carter de turbine[2014/50]
Examination procedure04.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
11.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/51]
03.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/51]
Documents cited:Search[IY]GB2069427  (BRITISH AEROSPACE) [I] 1-5,8-14 * page 1 - page 2; figures 2-4 * [Y] 6,7;
 [X]EP1752409  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0016] , [0024]; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]GB2298402  (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [Y] 1-5,8-14 * figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]US2012272496  (HERBOLD JOHN WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1,6,7,12 * paragraph [0020]; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]US3675788  (CATHERS WILLIAM P) [Y] 1-6,8-14 * column 4, line 69 - column 5, line 55; figures 1-6 *