blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2811123 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2811123



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 137
26.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
03.08.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
15.12.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.11.2014 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.11.2014 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 2
20.10.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.10.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 5
08.10.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
30.09.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2014 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.09.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
05.08.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 66
04.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
04.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
04.06.2014 Description Search / examination 25
04.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 6
04.06.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4