Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796134

EP2796134 - Combination of the peptide epoxyketone proteasome inhibitor carfilzomib with melphalan for use in the treatment of multiple myeloma [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]Combination of the peptide epoxyketone proteasome inhibitor carfilzomib with melphalan for use in the treatment of cancer
[2016/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 18.07.2018  [2018/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Onyx Therapeutics, Inc.
One Amgen Center Drive
Thousand Oaks, CA 91320 / US
[2016/36]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Onyx Therapeutics, Inc.
249 E. Grand Avenue
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kirk, Christopher J.
391 Carl St.
San Francisco, CA California 94117 / US
02 / Demo, Susan D.
241 Downey Street
San Francisco, CA California 94117 / US
03 / Bennett, Mark K.
9 Fieldbrook Place
Moraga, CA California 94556 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date14171395.821.10.2009
[2014/44]
Priority number, dateUS20080196945P21.10.2008         Original published format: US 196945 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796134
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2796134
Date:07.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/167, A61K38/08, A61K31/165, A61K38/04, A61P35/00, A61K38/55, A61K45/06, A61K38/06, A61K31/198
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesAL05.06.2014
BA05.06.2014
RS05.06.2014
TitleGerman:Kombination des Peptid-Epoxyketon-Proteasom-Inhibitors Carfilzomib mit Melphalan zur Verwendung bei der Behandlung von multiplem Myelom[2016/30]
English:Combination of the peptide epoxyketone proteasome inhibitor carfilzomib with melphalan for use in the treatment of multiple myeloma[2016/30]
French:Combinaison du peptide époxycétone inhibiteur du protéasome carfilzomib avec le melphalan pour utilisation dans le traitement du myélome multiple[2016/30]
Former [2014/44]Kombinationstherapie mit Peptidepoxyketonen
Former [2014/44]Combination of the peptide epoxyketone proteasome inhibitor carfilzomib with melphalan for use in the treatment of cancer
Former [2014/44]Thérapie de combinaison avec peptides d'époxycétones
Examination procedure05.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
12.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2016Fee for grant paid
24.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09822636.8  / EP2349313
Divisional application(s)EP16171281.5  / EP3090737
Opposition(s)08.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
10.08.2015Request for further processing filed
10.08.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.10.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
10.08.2015Request for further processing filed
10.08.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.10.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
[2018/29]
Former [2017/52]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV07.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006128611  (LEWIS EVAN R [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0110] * * paragraphs [0299] - [0300] * * paragraphs [0363] - [0364] * * claims 1, 28, 41 *;
 [XP]WO2009067453  (SYNDAX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-7 * page 1, paragraphs 3-4 * * page 2, paragraphs 8-9 * * page 11, paragraphs 60-61 - page 12 * * page 20, paragraph 101 * * page 21, paragraph 103 *
 [Y]  - KUHN DEBORAH J ET AL, "Potent activity of carfilzomib, a novel, irreversible inhibitor of the ubiquitin-proteasome pathway, against preclinical models of multiple myelorna", BLOOD, (200711), vol. 110, no. 9, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 3281 - 3290, XP002679911 [Y] 1-7 * page 3287, column 1, paragraph 1; table 1 * * page 3289 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2007-01-065888
 [Y]  - IVANCSITS DOUGLAS ET AL, "The proteasome inhibitor PR-171 inhibits cell growth, induces apoptosis, and overcomes de novo and acquired drug resistance in human multiple myeloma cells.", BLOOD, & 47TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; ATLANTA, GA, USA; DECEMBER 10 -13, 2005, (200511), vol. 106, no. 11, Part 1, ISSN 0006-4971, page 452A, XP002729829 [Y] 1-7 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DIMOPOULOS M A ET AL, "The role of novel drugs in multiple myeloma", ANNALS OF ONCOLOGY - EDUCATIONAL BOOK OF THE 33RD ESMO CONGRESS 200809 GB, (200809), vol. 19, no. SUPPL. 7, ISSN 0923-7534, pages vii121 - vii127, XP002729830 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/annonc/mdn444
 [Y]  - STERZ JAN ET AL, "The potential of proteasome inhibitors in cancer therapy", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, GB, (20080601), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:10.1517/13543780802122163, ISSN 1354-3784, pages 879 - 895, XP002602466 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543780802122163
by applicant   - GREENE, T.W.; WUTS, P.G.M., Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1999),
    - KOCIENSKI, P. J., Protecting Groups, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1994),
    - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104
    - KUMATORI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 7071 - 7075,
    - ALMOND ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (2002), vol. 16, pages 433 - 443,