Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2774539

EP2774539 - Blood collection device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Poly Medicure Limited
Plot No. 105, Sector 59 HSIIDC Industrial Area
Faridabad, Haryana 121004 / IN
[2016/07]
Former [2014/37]For all designated states
Poly Medicure Limited
Plot No. 105, Sector 59 HSIIDC Industrial Area
Faridabad, Haryana 121004 / IN
Inventor(s)01 / Baid, Rishi
W - 169 Greater Kailash - II
110048 New Delhi / IN
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Thum, Bernhard
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2016/07]
Former [2014/37]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14171411.307.09.2010
[2014/37]
Priority number, dateIN2009DEL186109.09.2009         Original published format: IN DE18612009
[2014/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2774539
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2774539
Date:17.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/151, A61B5/153, A61B5/15
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/07]
Former [2014/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Blutentnahme[2014/37]
English:Blood collection device[2014/37]
French:Dispositif pour prélèvement du sang[2014/37]
Examination procedure03.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
31.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2015Fee for grant paid
11.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.12.2015Information about intention to grant a patent
09.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10773981.5  / EP2349000
EP13150955.6  / EP2581041
Divisional application(s)EP15003536.8  / EP3011903
EP17199090.6  / EP3292818
Opposition(s)18.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
17.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.09.2010
AL17.02.2016
AT17.02.2016
BE17.02.2016
CY17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
DK17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
IS17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
MK17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
SM17.02.2016
TR17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
IE07.09.2016
LU07.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
MT30.09.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU07.09.2010
AT17.02.2016
BE17.02.2016
CY17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
DK17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
IS17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
MK17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
SM17.02.2016
TR17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
IE07.09.2016
LU07.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
MT30.09.2016
Former [2018/32]HU07.09.2010
AT17.02.2016
BE17.02.2016
CY17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
DK17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
IS17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
MK17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
SM17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
IE07.09.2016
LU07.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
MT30.09.2016
Former [2018/30]HU07.09.2010
AT17.02.2016
BE17.02.2016
CY17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
DK17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
IS17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
MK17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
SM17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
IE07.09.2016
LU07.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/41]AT17.02.2016
BE17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
DK17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
SM17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
IE07.09.2016
LU07.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/31]AT17.02.2016
BE17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
DK17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
SM17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2017/16]AT17.02.2016
BE17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
DK17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
SM17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2017/03]AT17.02.2016
BE17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
DK17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
SM17.02.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2016/50]AT17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
DK17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
SM17.02.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2016/49]AT17.02.2016
DK17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2016/46]AT17.02.2016
DK17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
NL17.02.2016
PL17.02.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
Former [2016/35]FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
NO17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0619096  (SUZUKI ISSEI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 5, lines 5-13,24-33 * * figures 10,11,15,16 *;
 [Y]EP1579805  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0093] * * figures 22,23,29-31 *;
 [A]US2005283093  (CONWAY HUGH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 27A,27B,28 *;
 [A]JP2000166903  (SUZUKI ISSEI) [A] 1-15 * abstract *