Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810869

EP2810869 - Lower joints between outboard wing boxes and center wing sections of aircraft wing assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2018/13]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cominsky, Kenneth D.
P.O. Box 3707
Seattle, WA Washington 98124 / US
02 / Charles, Jordan Daniel
P.O. Box 3707
Seattle, WA Washington 98124 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Howson, Richard Giles Bentham , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/13]Howson, Richard G.B. , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Former [2014/50]Howson, Richard G.B. , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14171416.205.06.2014
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateUS20131391309907.06.2013         Original published format: US201313913099
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810869
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810869
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B64C1/26
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:Untere Verbindungen zwischen Außenbord-Flügelschachteln und zentralen Flügelabschnitten eines Flugzeugs[2014/50]
English:Lower joints between outboard wing boxes and center wing sections of aircraft wing assemblies[2014/50]
French:Joints inférieurs entre des caissons d'aile extrême et des sections d'aile centrale d'assemblage d'ailes d'aéronef[2014/50]
Examination procedure05.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
04.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2018Fee for grant paid
15.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SI28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
IE05.06.2018
LU05.06.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
IE05.06.2018
LU05.06.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/21]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
IE05.06.2018
LU05.06.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/19]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
IE05.06.2018
LU05.06.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
LU05.06.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/10]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/45]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/40]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/35]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
NO28.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2970463  (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR]) [X] 1,3-6,12-14 * page 9, line 23 - page 13, line 15; figures 2-4 * [Y] 2,7-11;
 [X]US2011303357  (PLAZA TERESA LATORRE [ES], et al) [X] 1,12-14 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025]; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2009065644  (JACQUES EMMANUEL [FR]) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0017] - [0024]; figure 1 *;
 [YA]US2006018710  (DURAND JEAN-MARC [FR], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0026] , [0031] , [0034]; figure 2 * [A] 1;
 [YA]US2013020440  (HONORATO RUIZ FRANCISCO JAVIER [ES]) [Y] 7-11 * paragraph [0009]; figure 1 * [A] 1-6;
 [A]FR916967  (CONST AERONAUTIQUES DU CT SOC) [A] 1 * page 1, line 47 - page 2, line 38; figure 2 *
ExaminationUS2005116105
 US2008128550