EP2789349 - Liquid preparation comprising pimobendan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2017/36] |
Former [2014/42] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Folger, Martin Andreas Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH, Corporate Patents Binger Str. 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
Lehner, Stefan Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH, Corporate Patents Binger Str. 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2015/19] |
Former [2014/42] | 01 /
FOLGER, Martin Andreas Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH, Corporate Patents Binger Str. 173 55216 INGELHEIM AM RHEIN / DE | ||
02 /
LEHNER, Stefan Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH, Corporate Patents Binger Str. 173 55216 INGELHEIM AM RHEIN / DE | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2014/42] | Application number, filing date | 14171537.5 | 05.11.2007 | [2014/42] | Priority number, date | EP20060123567 | 07.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06123567 | [2014/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2789349 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2789349 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61P21/04, A61K47/69 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/501 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K47/40 (BR,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K47/6951 (EP,BR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,BR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/42] | A61K47/48, A61K9/00, A61K9/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2014/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | BA | 15.04.2015 | HR | 15.04.2015 | Title | German: | Flüssiges Präparat mit Pimobendan | [2014/42] | English: | Liquid preparation comprising pimobendan | [2014/42] | French: | Préparation liquide comprenant du pimobendane | [2014/42] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 18.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07822208.0 / EP2089060 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | LU | 05.11.2017 | MT | 05.11.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/28] |
Former [2019/47] | CY | 06.09.2017 | |
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | EE | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | EE | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | EE | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/13] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2006022562 (BOMAC RESEARCH LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,11-13 * claims 1-6,19-24,29-31 * * page 15, line 15 - page 16, line 4 * * claim 28 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]EP0335545 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13 * claims 1,3,17,27,29,30,32 * * page 116, line 1 - line 3 * * page 16, line 37 - line 43 * [Y] 1-15; | [YD]WO2005084647 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMED [DE], et al) [YD] 1-15 * claims 1-12,16 * | [XY] - PIEL G ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF A PARENTERAL AND AN ORAL FORMULATION OF ALBENDAZOLE WITH CYCLODEXTRINS", SCIENCES TECHNIQUES ET PRATIQUES STP PHARMA PRATIQUES, PARIS, FR, (1999), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 1157-1497, pages 257 - 260, XP008076739 [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11-13 * abstract * * page 257, column 2, paragraph 2 * * Introduction * * page 259; table 1 * * page 259, column 2, paragraph 6 * [Y] 1-15 | [XY] - BASSANI V L ET AL, "ENHANCED WATER-SOLUBILITY OF ALBENDAZOLE BY HYDROXYPROPYL-ss-CYCLODE XTRIN COMPLEXATION", JOURNAL OF INCLUSION PHENOMENA AND MOLECULAR RECOGNITION IN CHEMISTRY, KLUWER, DORDRECHT, NL, (199603), vol. 25, no. 1-3, ISSN 0923-0750, pages 149 - 152, XP008076331 [X] 1,2,4,6,11-13 * abstract * * page 150; figure 2 * * page 150, paragraph 2 * * Introduction, conclusion * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01041557 | by applicant | WO2005092343 | EP0008391 | EP0439030 | WO2005008467 | WO8502767 | US3459731 |