Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793139

EP2793139 - Method of using server, server reservation control apparatus, and program storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Nishimura, Takanori
c/o Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP
02 / Ihara, Keigo
c/o Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / Yoshimine, Takao
c/o Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
04 / Fukuda, Junko
c/o Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
05 / Sueyoshi, Takahiko
c/o Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Jackson, Jonathan Andrew
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date14171622.529.08.2001
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateJP2000026456131.08.2000         Original published format: JP 2000264561
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793139
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/00, H04L29/06, H04L29/08, G06F9/50, G06Q10/02, G06Q20/36, G06Q30/06
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verwendung eines Servers, Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Serverreservierung und Programmspeichermedium[2014/43]
English:Method of using server, server reservation control apparatus, and program storage medium[2014/43]
French:Procédé d'utilisation de serveur, appareil de contrôle de réservations et support de stockage de programme[2014/43]
Examination procedure04.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
20.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/49]
27.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/49]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01961166.4  / EP1315093
EP10012133.4  / EP2299367
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201818   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6041359  (BIRDWELL KENNETH J [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 4 * * column 7, line 17 - line 26 *;
 [X]US5583994  (RANGAN P VENKAT [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 17 - line 58 *