Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816549

EP2816549 - User bookmarks by touching the display of a music score while recording ambient audio [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/02]User bookmarks by touching the display of a music score while recording.
[2016/08]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Uemura, Norihiro
Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi 430-8650 / JP
 [2016/31]
Former [2014/52]01 / Uemura, Norihiro
Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, 430-8650 / JP
Representative(s)Ettmayr, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2016/31]
Former [2014/52]Ettmayr, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date14171747.010.06.2014
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateJP2013012643617.06.2013         Original published format: JP 2013126436
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816549
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2816549
Date:03.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0488, G10H1/00, // G11B27/10
[2016/08]
Former International [2015/02]G06F3/0488, G10H1/00, // G11B27/10, G10H1/36, H04N21/47
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/28]
Former [2014/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Benutzer-Lesezeichen durch Berühren angezeigter Musiknoten während der Aufnahme von Ambient Audio[2016/13]
English:User bookmarks by touching the display of a music score while recording ambient audio[2016/13]
French:Signets utilisateur par touché de l'affichage de la partition musicale durant un enregistrement de l'audio ambiante[2016/13]
Former [2015/02]BenutzerAudioaufzeichnungslesezeichen durch Berühren des Angezeigten Musiknoten während das Aufnehmen.
Former [2015/02]User bookmarks by touching the display of a music score while recording.
Former [2015/02]Signets utilisateur par touché de l'affichage de la partition pendant l'enregistrement de musique.
Examination procedure01.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/28]
14.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2016Fee for grant paid
22.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)04.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.06.2014
AL03.08.2016
AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
NL03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
[2019/31]
Former [2018/46]AL03.08.2016
AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
NL03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2018/11]AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
NL03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
NL03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT03.08.2016
BE03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
NL03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
NL03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT03.08.2016
ES03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
NL03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
GR04.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
NL03.08.2016
PL03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI03.08.2016
IT03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
NL03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT03.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US6275222  (DESAIN PETRUS WILHELMUS MARIA [NL]) [X] 1-15 * Time-based media file. Time-place mapping between media file and graphic.;; claim 1 * * annotation;; figure 8 * * Music "read through" on touchscreen and pointed at corresponding position in the music while listening to it; paragraph [summary] * * musical score.;; claim 4 * * time-position map;; figure 3 * * Following scanned score while listening to time-based media file;; figure 2 * * Relating time to position by moving pointing device over graphic while the media is rendered; paragraph [0006] * * time-position map; column 2, paragraph 3rd before last * * Time-position map for every page of the score; column 2, paragraph 2nd last - column 3, paragraphs 1-3 * * subsequent positions are stored when differing by a delay; column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 6 *;
 [Y]US2009251440  (EDGECOMB TRACY L [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * metadata, page numbers or position of written content within a page are stored and associated with written data; paragraph [0040] * * As audio recording device; paragraph [0003] * * audio bookmarks; paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * * Synchronizing recorded audio and captured handwriting; paragraph [0025] * * temporal location associated with audio data and stored; paragraph [0038] *;
 [Y]EP2251871  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * distance between starting and ending touch points;; figures 6,7; claim 5 * * synchronous display with replayed portion;; claim 1 * * lyrics phrases displayed in synchronization with progress of music replayed; paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * music from storage medium or created by a user; paragraphs [0021] , [0022] * * mobile telephone displays piano chords, musical scales in sync with music replay; paragraph [0131] * * karaoke; karaoke-like services; paragraph [0004] * * storage; paragraph [0098] *;
 [Y]WO2012035597  (PIONEER CORP [JP]; SHIROSAKI YASUO [JP]; FUKUSHIMA AKIO [JP]; OHKUBO H) [Y] 1-15 * Music data was recorded on CD , DVD, hard disk, non-volatile memory; paragraph [0044]; claim 7 * * lyrics displayed on touch panel. User selection on the touch screen.; paragraph [0083]; figure 5 * * lyric contained in music score; paragraphs [0012] , [0 55] , [0 83] *;
 [Y]US2008060507  (WELCHERING HELMUT [US]) [Y] 1-15 * Music navigation. Page mode; Bar mode. Markers.; paragraph [0029] * * Music recording sessions; paragraph [0009] * * jump to temporal position associated with audio bookmark; paragraph [0051] * * fast-forward button; paragraph [0073] * * touch screen; paragraph [0074] * * instructions; rehearsals; paragraphs [0028] , [0 56] , [0 77] *
by applicantJP2007108292
 JPH09320148
 US2007119292
 US2009251440