Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813774

EP2813774 - Gas extraction vent with a rate that is simultaneously variable depending on humidity and pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VTI
ZAE le Barnier
34110 Frontignan / FR
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Fraisse, Jean-Michel
825 chemin des Charbonnières
34540 Balaruc Le Vieux / FR
02 / Bouis, Florian
24 rue Gambetta
34200 Sete / FR
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Cabinet BARRE LAFORGUE & associés
35, rue Lancefoc
31000 Toulouse / FR
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date14171838.710.06.2014
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateFR2013005549113.06.2013         Original published format: FR 1355491
[2014/51]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2813774
Date:17.12.2014
Language:FR
[2014/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2813774
Date:04.11.2015
Language:FR
[2015/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:F24F11/00, F24F11/047
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Gasextraktionsöffnung mit Durchsatz, der gleichzeitig in Abhängigkeit von der Feuchtigkeit und dem Druck variiert werden kann[2014/51]
English:Gas extraction vent with a rate that is simultaneously variable depending on humidity and pressure[2014/51]
French:Bouche d'extraction de gaz à débit simultanément variable en fonction de l'humidité et de la pression[2014/51]
Examination procedure02.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/23]
03.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/23]
29.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201805   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP2604942  (VTI [FR]) [XP] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [AD]FR2729746  (ZANIEWSKI MICHEL [FR]) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2620202  (ZANIEWSKI MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 40 - page 10, line 19; figures 1,7 *;
 [A]EP0087989  (SERVA SOC [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2847661  (INVENT OR [FR]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2805032  (ZANIEWSKI MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2589996  (SERVA SOC [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantFR2729746