Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813625

EP2813625 - Seat stand and working machine including same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/51]Sheet stand and working machine including same
[2016/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome
Saeki-ku
Hiroshima-shi
Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Sakatani, Masanori
c/o Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd;
2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome
Saeki-ku
Hiroshima-shi
Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP
02 / Hiraoka, Yukio
c/o Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd;
2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome
Saeki-ku
Hiroshima-shi
Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP
03 / Yamamoto, Keiji
c/o Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd;
2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome
Saeki-ku
Hiroshima-shi
Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date14172078.912.06.2014
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateJP2013012438313.06.2013         Original published format: JP 2013124383
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813625
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813625
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:E02F9/16, E02F9/20, E02F3/32, // E02F9/22, B66C13/54
[2016/38]
Former International [2014/51]E02F9/16, E02F9/20, // E02F9/22, B66C13/54
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sitzunterstützung und Arbeitsmaschine damit[2016/38]
English:Seat stand and working machine including same[2016/38]
French:Support de siege et machine de travail comprenant celui-ci[2016/38]
Former [2014/51]Folie und Arbeitsmaschine damit
Former [2014/51]Sheet stand and working machine including same
Former [2014/51]Support de feuille et machine de travail comprenant celui-ci
Examination procedure11.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
09.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2017Fee for grant paid
18.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)04.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.06.2014
AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IE12.06.2017
LU12.06.2017
MT12.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IE12.06.2017
LU12.06.2017
MT12.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/39]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IE12.06.2017
LU12.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/23]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IE12.06.2017
LU12.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/21]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
LU12.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/11]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2007303213  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [X] 1-6,8,9,13 * figures 1-11 * [I] 7,10-12;
 [XA]EP2557237  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-13;
 [XA]JP2005255109  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [X] 1 * figures 1-7 * [A] 2-13;
 [XA]JP2005282110  (KUBOTA KK) [X] 1 * figures 1-16 * [A] 2-13;
 [XA]JP2009024395  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-13;
 [XA]JP2010024715  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-12 * [A] 4-13
by applicantJPH0270056U
 JP2005105591