Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2818835 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2818835



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 203
21.06.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.08.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.06.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
29.06.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
29.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
26.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.02.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.02.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.02.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 41
26.01.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
25.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.08.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
25.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
25.08.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
25.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.03.2015 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
29.01.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.01.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 2
29.01.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
19.01.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.08.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
12.08.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 57
12.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
12.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 5
12.06.2014 Description Search / examination 28
12.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 8
12.06.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5