Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818835

EP2818835 - Control surface calibration system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2016/33]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Yeeles, Christopher J.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606 / US
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14172229.812.06.2014
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateUS20131391807914.06.2013         Original published format: US201313918079
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2818835
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2818835
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2818835
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/244, B64C13/00, G01B21/04
[2015/10]
Former International [2015/01]G01D5/244
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:Steuerflächenkalibrierungssystem[2015/01]
English:Control surface calibration system[2015/01]
French:Système d'étalonnage de surface de commande[2015/01]
Examination procedure12.06.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
25.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2016Fee for grant paid
29.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)18.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.06.2014
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU12.06.2014
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/46]AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/11]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT17.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2005172695  (FURZE PAUL A [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-13 * paragraphs [0015] - [0076] * [Y] 4;
 [Y]EP1901153  (OFFIS E V [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0197] , [0289] *;
 [XA]WO2012152809  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]; JOBST ANDREAS [DE]; KOSTKA GUENTHER [DE) [X] 1-3,5-13 * page 1, line 26 - page 27, line 34 * [A] 4;
 [XY]DE10233153  (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-13 * paragraphs [0008] - [0033] * [Y] 4