Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813718

EP2813718 - Bearing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daido Metal Company Ltd.
13F, Nagoya Hirokoji Bldg.
3-1, Sakae 2-chome
Naka-ku
Nagoya / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Kato, Kenta
c/o DAIDO METAL COMPANY LTD.
Maehara Aza Tendoshinden
Inuyama-shi, Aichi / JP
02 / Yamamoto, Takeharu
c/o DAIDO METAL COMPANY LTD.
Maehara Aza Tendoshinden
Inuyama-shi, Aichi / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Beckmann, Claus
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date14172356.913.06.2014
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateJP2013012517114.06.2013         Original published format: JP 2013125171
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813718
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813718
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16C33/10
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:Lagervorrichtung[2014/51]
English:Bearing device[2014/51]
French:Dispositif d'appui[2014/51]
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
26.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2016Fee for grant paid
21.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.06.2014
AT04.01.2017
CY04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
IE13.06.2017
LU13.06.2017
MT13.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU13.06.2014
AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
IE13.06.2017
LU13.06.2017
MT13.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
IE13.06.2017
LU13.06.2017
MT13.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/39]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
IE13.06.2017
LU13.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/23]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
IE13.06.2017
LU13.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/21]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
LU13.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/11]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO2012123213  (FEDERAL MOGUL WIESBADEN GMBH [DE]; GARNIER THIERRY [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * figure 2.7 *;
 [A]EP2541080  (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1,2,6 *;
 [A]US2163586  (COLEMAN GILBERT R) [A] 1-6 * page 1 - page 2; figure 2 *
by applicantWO2012123213