Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786859

EP2786859 - Apparatus for forming three-dimensional objects using linear solidification [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/41]Apparatus and method for forming three-dimensional objects using linear solidification
[2019/11]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Global Filtration Systems, A DBA of Gulf Filtration Systems Inc.
214 North Beech Daly Road
Dearborn Heights, MI 48127 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / El-Siblani, Ali
214 North Beech Daly Road
Dearborn Heigths, MI Michigan 48127 / US
02 / Shkolnik, Alexandr
7364 Hollywood Blvd. 301
Los Angeles, CA California 90046 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[2019/32]
Former [2014/41]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14172357.727.06.2012
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateUS201161502020P28.06.2011         Original published format: US 201161502020 P
US201261598666P14.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261598666 P
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2786859
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2786859
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786859
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:B29C64/124, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B29C64/241, B29C64/236, B29C64/264
[2019/10]
Former International [2014/41]B29C67/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/41]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Bildung dreidimensionaler Gegenstände mittels linearer Erstarrung[2019/11]
English:Apparatus for forming three-dimensional objects using linear solidification[2019/11]
French:Appareil permettant de former des objets tridimensionnels à l'aide de solidification linéaire[2019/11]
Former [2014/41]Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bildung dreidimensionaler Gegenstände mittels linearer Erstarrung
Former [2014/41]Apparatus and method for forming three-dimensional objects using linear solidification
Former [2014/41]Appareil et procédé permettant de former des objets tridimensionnels à l'aide de solidification linéaire
Examination procedure24.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/41]
17.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2019Fee for grant paid
14.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12804540.8  / EP2726264
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003052105  (NAGANO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 2,3,7 * figure 1 * * page 9, paragraph [0117] *;
 [IY]WO2011064725  (AEROSUD INNOVATION & TRAINING CT PTY LTD [ZA], et al) [I] 1-12 * figures 2, 5 * * page 15, lines 13-18 * [Y] 13-15;
 [Y]US2004036974  (IIZUKA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 13,14 * figure 1 * * page 3, paragraph [0034] * * page 4, paragraph [0044] *;
 [Y]EP1995623  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 15 * figure 2 *