Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816744

EP2816744 - Method and apparatus for digital polarization scrambling in coherent optical communication systems employing both transmit and receive digital signal processing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, EE, ES, SK
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE (USA) Inc.
33 Wood Avenue South Suite 705
Iselin, New Jersey 08830 / US
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / CAI, Yi
c/o ZTE (USA) Inc.
33 Wood Avenue South 705
Iselin, NJ 08830 / US
 [2015/08]
Former [2014/52]01 / Yi, Cai
c/o ZTE (USA) Inc.
33 Wood Avenue South 705
Iselin, NJ 08830 / US
Representative(s)Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date14172540.816.06.2014
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateUS201361835925P17.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361835925 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816744
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2816744
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/2569, H04B10/61
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2014/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für digitales Polarisationsscrambling in kohärenten optischen Kommunikationssystemen mit digitaler Sende- und Empfangssignalverarbeitung[2014/52]
English:Method and apparatus for digital polarization scrambling in coherent optical communication systems employing both transmit and receive digital signal processing[2014/52]
French:Procédé et appareil de brouillage de polarisation numérique dans des systèmes de communication optique cohérents utilisant à la fois un traitement de signal numérique de transmission et de réception[2014/52]
Examination procedure18.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
15.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2018Fee for grant paid
20.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/22]AL29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT29.08.2018