blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2816744 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410270516 EP14172540



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9209900Global Dossier 08.12.2015B2
US2014369684 18.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414305190 16.06.2014
US201361835925 17.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104243039BGlobal Dossier 17.05.2017B
CN104243039 24.12.2014A
Priority number Date
US201361835925 17.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2816744Global Dossier 29.08.2018B1
EP2816744 24.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361835925 17.06.2013