Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818733

EP2818733 - Fastening element, fastening system with the fastening element and method for fitting a light holder with an electronic module by means of the fastening system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITZ Innovations- und Technologiezentrum GmbH
Klienbahnstrasse 27
59759 Arnsberg / DE
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Drees, Frank
Steinacker 15a
58840 Plettenberg / DE
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 30 02 08
51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2018/21]
Former [2015/01]Lippert, Stachow & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 30 02 08
51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date14172606.716.06.2014
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateDE20131021114914.06.2013         Original published format: DE102013211149
[2015/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818733
Date:31.12.2014
Language:DE
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2818733
Date:23.05.2018
Language:DE
[2018/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16B2/24, F21V19/00
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Befestigungselement, Befestigungssystem mit Befestigungselement und Verfahren zum Bestücken eines Leuchtenträgers mit einem elektronischen Modul mittels des Befestigungssystems[2015/01]
English:Fastening element, fastening system with the fastening element and method for fitting a light holder with an electronic module by means of the fastening system[2015/01]
French:Élément de fixation, système de fixation doté de l'élément de fixation et procédé destiné à équiper un support d'éclairage d'un module électronique au moyen du système de fixation[2015/01]
Examination procedure29.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
30.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2018Fee for grant paid
10.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)26.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE16.06.2018
LU16.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE16.06.2018
LU16.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/21]CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE16.06.2018
LU16.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/19]CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE16.06.2018
LU16.06.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/17]CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
LU16.06.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/15]CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/11]CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
NO23.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE202012001835U  (BJB GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-11 * abstract * [Y] 6,7,13;
 [X]DE102012206695  (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,9-12 * abstract *;
 [X]DE29623048U  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,9-12 * figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]EP2138757  (GODFREY SCOTT [CA]) [Y] 6,7,13 * paragraph [0048]; figures 6a-6c *
by applicantWO2012096288
 DE102009043760