Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819172

EP2819172 - Optical element array and solid-state imaging device including the array [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawabata, Kazunari
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA;
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / Iba, Jun
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA;
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
03 / Wada, Zempei
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA;
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date14172669.517.06.2014
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateJP2013013705028.06.2013         Original published format: JP 2013137050
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819172
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819172
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/146, G02B3/00
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anordnung optischer Elemente und Festkörper-Bildgebungsvorrichtung mit der Anordnung[2015/01]
English:Optical element array and solid-state imaging device including the array[2015/01]
French:Réseau d'élément optique et dispositif d'imagerie à semi-conducteurs comprenant le réseau[2015/01]
Examination procedure26.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
30.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2017Fee for grant paid
07.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.06.2014
AT22.03.2017
CY22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU17.06.2014
AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/43]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/39]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/29]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/23]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/21]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
LU17.06.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/11]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2009174945  (LIN YU-TSUNG [TW], et al) [X] 2 * figures 6-9 * [A] 1,3-21;
 [AD]JP2007335723  (FUJIFILM CORP) [AD] 1-21 * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]US2006170810  (KIM SAE-YOUNG [KR]) [A] 1-21 * figures 7-18 *;
 [A]US2006027825  (KURIYAMA TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2007335723