Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2819172


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
26.01.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
17.02.2017 (Expected) grant published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.02.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.09.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2015 Change - designated states published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
10.07.2015 Change - request for examination published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
03.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
30.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
28.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]