Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818188

EP2818188 - Hydrophilic lubricant coatings for medical devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.01.2017  [2017/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc.
One Scimed Place
Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Wang, Lixiao
12822-86th Place North
Maple Grove, MN Minnesota 55369 / US
02 / Yang, Dachuan
11 Norz Drive
Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US
03 / Chen, John Jianhua
4725 Terraceview Lance North
Plymouth, MN Minnesota 55446 / US
04 / Wang, Yiqun Bruce
6669 Quantico Lane North
Maple Grove, MN Minnesota 55311 / US
05 / Monroe, Lance A.
3917 Virginia Avenue North
New Hope, MN Minnesota 55427 / US
06 / Munsinger, Joel R.
1090-B Court Drive
Duluth, GA Georgia 30096 / US
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14172757.828.09.2000
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateUS1999040698728.09.1999         Original published format: US 406987
[2015/01]
Previously filed application, dateEP2008000092528.09.2000
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818188
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61L29/08, A61F2/95
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2015/20]
Former [2015/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hydrophile Gleitbeschichtungen für medizinische Vorrichtungen[2015/01]
English:Hydrophilic lubricant coatings for medical devices[2015/01]
French:Revêtements hydrophiles pour dispositifs médicaux[2016/15]
Former [2015/01]Revêtements hydrophiliques pour dispositifs médicaux
Examination procedure30.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/20]
23.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/04]
09.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/04]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00968484.6  / EP1216068
EP08000925.1  / EP1917986
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201617   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO9811828  (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 35 * * page 5, line 16 - line 18 * * claims 1,21,23 * [I] 2,3,6-8
by applicantUS5084315
 US5266359
 US5272012
 US5647846
 US5509899
 US5849368
 US5066285
 US5466230
 US5651781
 US4445509
 US4990134
 US5534007
 US5843120
 US19980122431