Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816871

EP2816871 - Heat exchange device and heating device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.12.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstrasse 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[2015/13]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstr. 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Seewald, Wolfgang
Schumannstraße 18
71732 Tamm / DE
02 / Krumbach, Karl-Gerd
Fliederweg 5
71576 Burgstetten / DE
03 / Kohl, Michael
Südstraße 23
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Grauel, Andreas
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Wartbergstrasse 14
70191 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Grauel, Andreas
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Presselstrasse 10
70191 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date14172836.017.06.2014
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateDE20131021157919.06.2013         Original published format: DE102013211579
[2014/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816871
Date:24.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H05B6/10, F24H1/10, F28F13/12
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2014/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wärmeübertragereinrichtung und Heizvorrichtung[2014/52]
English:Heat exchange device and heating device[2014/52]
French:Échangeur thermique et dispositif de chauffage[2014/52]
Examination procedure23.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
18.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2009130761  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,10,12 * abstract * * figure 6 * * figures 14-16 * [I] 4,7-9,11;
 [XI]GB755570  (UNITHERM OSTERREICHISCHE GES F) [X] 1,5,10,12 * page 2, line 11 - line 32; figure 2 * * page 2, line 83 - line 85; figure 2 * * page 2, line 87 - line 92; figure 2 * [I] 2-4,6-9,11;
 [A]GB787125  (CARL SCHORG) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 57; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO2011013144  (THERMAX LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2873433  (USUI KOKUSAI SANGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *