Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787710

EP2787710 - Agile network protocol for secure communications with assured system availability [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Change - divisional application(s)published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VirnetX Inc.
308 Dorla Court, Suite 206
P.O. Box 439
Zephyr Cove, NV 89448-0439 / US
[2019/52]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
VirnetX Inc.
308 Dorla Court, Suite 206
P.O. Box 439
Zephyr Cove, NV 89448-0439 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Munger, Edmund
1101 Opaca Court
Crownsville, MD 21032 / US
02 / Schmidt, Douglas
230 Oak Court
Severna Park, MD 21146 / US
03 / Short, Robert
38710 Goose Creek Lane
Leesburg, VA 20175 / US
04 / Larson, Victor
12026 Lisa Marie Court
Fairfax, VA 22033 / US
05 / Williamson, Michael
23203 Ocala Circle
South Riding, VA 20152 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Finnegan Europe LLP
1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BG / GB
[2019/52]
Former [2014/41]Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14172837.812.02.2001
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateUS2000050478315.02.2000         Original published format: US 504783
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2787710
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2787710
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787710
Date:25.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L29/12, // H04L12/46, H04L12/701
[2015/02]
Former International [2014/41]H04L29/06, H04L29/12, H04L12/701, H04L12/703, H04L12/707
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2015/33]
Former [2014/41]CH,  DE,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL 
TitleGerman:Agiles Netzwerkprotokoll zur sicheren Kommunikation mit gesicherter Systemverfügbarkeit[2014/41]
English:Agile network protocol for secure communications with assured system availability[2014/41]
French:Protocole de réseau agile pour communications sécurisées avec une disponibilité du système assurée[2014/41]
Examination procedure07.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
16.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2019Fee for grant paid
13.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01910528.7  / EP1305914
EP10003518.7  / EP2197176
Divisional application(s)EP19219553.5
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 19
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0887979  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-9 * column 2, lines 25-40 * * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 23 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 8 * * column 6, line 45 - column 10, line 58 * * column 11, line 35 - column 15, line 31 * [A] 4;
 [E]WO0150688  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [E] 1-3,5-9 * page 9, lines 19-28 * * page 11, line 18 - page 13, line 21 *
 [Y]  - Gaur Nalneesh, "Securing Name Servers on UNIX", LINUX JOURNAL, no. 68, (199912), URL: http://www.linuxjournal.com/node/3691/print, (20141127), XP055155384 [Y] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document *