Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816604

EP2816604 - Array substrate and organic light-emitting display including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
17113, 1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
[2015/40]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
95, Samsung 2 Ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-City
Gyeonggi-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kwak, Won Kyu
No. 312-1602, 177, Migeum-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14172844.417.06.2014
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateKR2013006903917.06.2013         Original published format: KR 20130069039
KR2013012541621.10.2013         Original published format: KR 20130125416
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2816604
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2816604
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/32, H01L27/12, H01L23/00
[2015/11]
Former International [2014/52]H01L27/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2014/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Array-Substrat und organische lichtemittierende Anzeige damit[2014/52]
English:Array substrate and organic light-emitting display including the same[2014/52]
French:Substrat de réseau et affichage électroluminescent organique l'incluant[2014/52]
Examination procedure13.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
08.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2006202206  (KOYAMA JUN [JP] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0072]; figure 1 * [Y] 2-15;
 [XY]WO2012164882  (SHARP KK [JP]; FUJIWARA MASAKI) [X] 1 * figure 15 * [Y] 2-15;
 [Y]EP2323466  (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 2-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0067]; figure 5 *;
 [E]WO2014126403  (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-15 * figures 2-3 *