Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815874

EP2815874 - Staggered bevels for continuous compression molding tooling dies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.11.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Prebil, Charles Richard
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Mail Code: S245-1018
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
02 / Wilkerson, Randall Dow
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Mail Code: S245-1018
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
03 / Froeschner, Neal
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Mail Code: S245-1018
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14172915.218.06.2014
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateUS20131392344621.06.2013         Original published format: US201313923446
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815874
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:B29C70/52, B29C70/46, // B29K101/12, B29L31/30
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Abgestufte Abschrägungen für kontinuierliche Formpresswerkzeugmatrizen[2014/52]
English:Staggered bevels for continuous compression molding tooling dies[2014/52]
French:Biseaux décalés pour matrices d'outillage de moulage par compression en continu[2014/52]
Examination procedure18.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
13.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP2599604  (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 1,11 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057]; figures 5-5d; claims 1,2 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 9,10;
 [Y]EP0056689  (HALLITE DEV LTD [GB]) [Y] 7,8 * page 6, line 27 - line 32; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2009106340  (AIRBUS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,11 * figure -; claim 1 *
by applicantUS7807005
 US7871553
 US8333858