Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792507

EP2792507 - Run-flat tire [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2016/45]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Wakiyama, Tadashi
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
Technical Center
1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho 3-chome
Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
 [2016/45]
Former [2014/43]01 / Wakiyama, Takashi
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
Technical Center
1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho 3-chome
Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14173081.211.03.2010
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateJP2009005799011.03.2009         Original published format: JP 2009057990
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792507
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792507
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60C17/00, B60C13/00, B60C15/06
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:Notlaufreifen[2014/43]
English:Run-flat tire[2014/43]
French:Pneu de roulage à plat[2014/43]
Examination procedure19.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
27.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2016Fee for grant paid
28.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10750892.1  / EP2407321
Opposition(s)10.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.03.2010
AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CY09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
MK09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
GB11.03.2017
IE11.03.2017
LU11.03.2017
MT11.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU11.03.2010
AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CY09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
GB11.03.2017
IE11.03.2017
LU11.03.2017
MT11.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2019/31]HU11.03.2010
AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
GB11.03.2017
IE11.03.2017
LU11.03.2017
MT11.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
GB11.03.2017
IE11.03.2017
LU11.03.2017
MT11.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
GB11.03.2017
IE11.03.2017
LU11.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
LU11.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/35]AT09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV09.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0958229  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0507184  (BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * figure 2; claims 1-7 *;
 [A]US4129162  (DEWITT MARION A) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 5-10; figure 1 *;
 [A]JP2007191154  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJP2007106398