Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800094

EP2800094 - Oversampling in a combined transposer filter bank [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dolby International AB
Apollo Building, 3E
Herikerbergweg 1-35
1101 CN Amsterdam / NL
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Villemoes, Lars
c/o Dolby Sweden AB
Gävlegatan 12A
113 30 Stockholm / SE
02 / Ekstrand, Per
c/o Dolby Sweden AB
Gävlegatan 12A
113 30 Stockholm / SE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe
Apollo Building, 3E
Herikerbergweg 1-35
1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date14173151.325.05.2010
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateUS20090253775P21.10.2009         Original published format: US 253775 P
US20100330786P03.05.2010         Original published format: US 330786 P
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800094
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800094
Date:22.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G10L21/038
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Überabtastung in einer kombinierten Umsetzer-Filterbank[2014/45]
English:Oversampling in a combined transposer filter bank[2014/45]
French:Suréchantillonnage dans un banc de filtres de transposeur combiné[2017/24]
Former [2014/45]Suréchantillonnage dans un banc de filtres de transposition combinés
Examination procedure04.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
04.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2017Fee for grant paid
16.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10730734.0  / EP2491557
Divisional application(s)EP17192422.8  / EP3291231
Opposition(s)23.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
IE25.05.2018
LU25.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/19]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
IE25.05.2018
LU25.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
LU25.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
NO22.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO9857436  (LILJERYD LARS GUSTAF [SE]; EKSTRAND PER RUNE ALBIN [SE]; HENN LARS FRE) [AD] 1-20 * page 1, line 4 - line 9 * * page 12, line 1 - page 15, line 26 * * figures 9c,13 *;
 [A]US2003187663  (TRUMAN MICHAEL MEAD [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0071] * * figure 4 *
 [A]  - NAGEL FREDERIK ET AL, "A Phase Vocoder Driven Bandwidth Extension Method with Novel Transient Handling for Audio Codecs", AES CONVENTION 126; MAY 2009, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20090501), XP040508993 [A] 1-20 * p. 3, section 3., Harmonic Bandwidth Extension *
 [A]  - FREDERIK NAGEL ET AL, "A HARMONIC BANDWIDTH EXTENSION METHOD FOR AUDIO CODECS", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING 2009, TAIPEI, (20090419), pages 145 - 148, XP002527507 [A] 1-20 * p. 146, section 3. Method * * figure 5 *
by applicantWO9857436