Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819437

EP2819437 - Method and apparatus for localization of streaming sources in a hearing assistance system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.04.2019  [2019/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Starkey Laboratories, Inc.
6600 Washington Avenue South
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Recker, Karrie LaRae
4000 W. 42nd Street
Edina, MN 55416 / US
02 / Durant, Eric A.
741 N. Milwaukee Street, 202
Milwaukee, WI 53202 / US
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Dentons UK and Middle East LLP
One Fleet Place
London EC4M 7WS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date14173525.823.06.2014
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateUS20131392779926.06.2013         Original published format: US201313927799
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819437
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00, H04S7/00, H04R5/04, // H04R5/033, H04S1/00
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Lokalisierung von Streaming-Quellen in einem Hörhilfesystem[2015/01]
English:Method and apparatus for localization of streaming sources in a hearing assistance system[2015/01]
French:Procédé et appareil de localisation de sources de diffusion en continu dans un système d'assistance auditive[2015/01]
Examination procedure23.06.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
30.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/14]
12.10.2018Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/14]
14.11.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2584794  (OTICON AS [DK]) [X] 1-4,6-15 * the whole document * [I] 5;
 [XAI]US2012128184  (KIM HEE-SU [KR] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5,8,10,12,14 * the whole document * [A] 4,11 [I] 6,7,9,13,15;
 [XA]WO2010086462  (PHONAK AG [CH]; HASLER IVO [CH]; KNAUS MICHA [CH]) [X] 1-6,10-12 * the whole document * [A] 7-9,13-15;
 [XA]WO2007112756  (UNIV AALBORG [DK]; HAMMERSHOEI DORTHE [DK]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-13,15 * the whole document * [A] 5,8,14;
 [XP]EP2736276  (GN STORE NORD AS [DK]) [XP] 1-3,6,9,10,12,15 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0122]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2012072206  (TSUCHINAGA YOSHITERU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0155833  (LAKE TECHNOLOGY LTD [AU]; LAYTON LEONARD CHARLES [AU]; MCGRATH DAVID S) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *