Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783592

EP2783592 - Watch strap strip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROLEX SA
3-5-7 rue François Dussaud
1211 Genève 26 / CH
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Catheline, Adrien
367 route de Bellegarde
F-74520 Valleiry / FR
02 / Grasser, Felix
55 Avenue Eugène-Lance
CH-1212 Grand-Lancy / CH
03 / Oulevey, Frédéric
Chemin des Molards 6
CH-1188 Saint-George / CH
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Moinas & Savoye SARL
19A, rue de la Croix-d'Or
1204 Genève / CH
[2017/33]
Former [2014/40]Moinas & Savoye SA
42, rue Plantamour
1201 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date14173541.505.04.2012
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateCH2011000000606.04.2011         Original published format: CH 62011
EP2011040524107.04.2011         Original published format: EP 11405241
[2014/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783592
Date:01.10.2014
Language:FR
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783592
Date:16.08.2017
Language:FR
[2017/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A44C5/00, A44C5/14
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Uhrarmband[2014/40]
English:Watch strap strip[2014/40]
French:Brin de bracelet de montre[2014/40]
Examination procedure26.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
28.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2017Fee for grant paid
06.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12713859.2  / EP2693910
Opposition(s)17.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
IE05.04.2018
LU05.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
[2019/19]
Former [2019/12]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
LU05.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
Former [2019/08]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
LU05.04.2018
Former [2018/52]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/24]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]EP0116384  (LASSALE JEAN SA [CH]) [I] 1-11,13-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 9 * * page 3, line 14 - line 18 * * page 4, line 19 - line 29 * * page 5, line 22 - line 34 *;
 [I]CH502787  (MOVADO MONTRES [CH]; MONTRES ZENITH S A FAB [CH]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]US3543975  (BAUER KURT) [I] 1,4-6,11,13,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 11 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 14 - line 37 * * column 2, line 69 - line 74 *
by applicantFR1591988
 AT400551B
 AT407692B
 JPH07329110