Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2818764 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2818764



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 162
20.09.2017 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.09.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.09.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
11.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.09.2017 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
06.06.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.06.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.05.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.09.2016 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 General enquiry Search / examination 1
10.06.2016 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.06.2016 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
14.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
14.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.03.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.02.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.02.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 6
13.02.2015 European search report Search / examination 4
03.12.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.10.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
28.10.2014 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
16.10.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
01.09.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
18.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Description Search / examination 20
13.08.2014 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
12.08.2014 Deficiencies in application documents - annex B Search / examination 3
24.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Description Search / examination 20
24.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 12
24.06.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
24.06.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1