EP2819075 - Method and apparatus for automatically synchronizing electronic devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jongmyung C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Eunmi C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Donggyu C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Jin, Pyeonggyu C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2015/01] | Application number, filing date | 14173662.9 | 24.06.2014 | [2015/01] | Priority number, date | KR20130076075 | 28.06.2013 Original published format: KR 20130076075 | KR20140040268 | 04.04.2014 Original published format: KR 20140040268 | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2819075 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06F16/27 (US);
G09B5/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2015/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur automatischen Synchronisierung elektronischer Vorrichtungen | [2015/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for automatically synchronizing electronic devices | [2015/01] | French: | Procédé et appareil permettant de synchroniser automatiquement des dispositifs électroniques | [2015/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.03.2019 | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/22] | 21.01.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 06.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009259711 (DRIEU GILLES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0020] - [0045] * [I] 1-15; | [I]US2010227304 (HORIKAWA NAOTO [JP]) [I] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0023] - [0045] *; | [I]US2012102409 (FAN JAMES [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] - [0107] , [0111] - [0119] - [0126] , [0127] , [0130] , [0132] , [0136] - [0138] - [0176] - [0178] *; | [I]US2012177067 (CHO JEONG-MI [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0043] - [0056] - [0140] * |