Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2783573 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2783573



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 199
08.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.02.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
08.02.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 Annex Search / examination 14
28.09.2017 Description Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.09.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
01.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.09.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.04.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
25.04.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.01.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
17.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.01.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.11.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
09.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.07.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
07.07.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.06.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
22.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.06.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.06.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.05.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.05.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
28.05.2015 European search report Search / examination 3
13.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.04.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
18.09.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.09.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Annex Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Description Search / examination 54
24.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 4
24.06.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
24.08.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32