Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2783573

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure28.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA RS
 
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140624
 
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2391222
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:LUNDGREN, KRISTOFFER
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:ANDERSEN, JOERGEN
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:GUNTHER, WILLIAM STUART
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:HOLST, HANS HENRIK
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A23C 3/037 20060101ALI20150521BHEP
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A23C 7/04 20060101ALI20150521BHEP
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A23C 9/142 20060101ALI20150521BHEP
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA RS
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A23C 9/152 20060101ALI20150521BHEP
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A23C 9/15 20060101ALI20150521BHEP
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A23C 3/00 20060101AFI20150521BHEP
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A23C 9/00 20060101ALI20150521BHEP
 
Event date:10.02.2016 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:10.02.2016 
Event description:REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED
EXTENSION STATE:BA
Payment DATE:20151222
 
Event date:10.02.2016 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20151222
 
Event date:10.02.2016 
Event description:REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED
EXTENSION STATE:RS
Payment DATE:20151222
 
Event date:10.02.2016 
Event description:REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED
EXTENSION STATE:AL
Payment DATE:20151222
 
Event date:10.08.2016 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20160707