Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783573

EP2783573 - Long shelf life milk and milk-related products, and a process and milk processing plant for their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arla Foods Amba
Sønderhøj 14
8260 Viby J / DK
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Holst, Hans Henrik
Rosenallé 86
6920 Videbæk / DK
02 / Gunther, William Stuart
Gammel Bøvlvej 24
7260 Sønder Omme / DK
03 / Lundgren, Kristoffer
Färgaresträtet 3
SE-31131 Falkenberg / SE
04 / Andersen, Jørgen
Bøgens Kvarter 107
DK-7400 Herning / DK
 [2015/22]
Former [2014/40]01 / Holst, Hans Henrik
Rosenallé 86
6920 Videbæk / DK
02 / Gunther, William Stuart
Gammel Bøvlvej 24
7260 Sønder Omme / DK
03 / Lundgren, Kristoffer
Kristinebergsvägen 10
11244 Stockholm / SE
04 / Andersen, Jørgen
Engens Kvarter 89
7400 Herning / DK
Representative(s)Guardian IP Consulting I/S
Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Østergaard, Steen
Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
Application number, filing date14173696.727.01.2010
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateUS20090147614P27.01.2009         Original published format: US 147614 P
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2783573
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2783573
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:A23C3/00, A23C7/04, A23C9/00, A23C9/15, A23C9/152, A23C3/037, A23C9/142
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/06]
Former [2014/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesAL22.12.2015
BA22.12.2015
RS22.12.2015
TitleGerman:Milch und milchzugehörige Produkte mit langer Haltbarkeit und Verfahren und Milchverarbeitungsanlage zu deren Herstellung[2014/40]
English:Long shelf life milk and milk-related products, and a process and milk processing plant for their manufacture[2014/40]
French:Lait et produits laitiers de conservation longue durée, procédé et installation de traitement du lait pour leur fabrication[2014/40]
Examination procedure22.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/06]
07.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10702017.4  / EP2391222
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]US6372276  (LINDQUIST ANDERS [SE]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 15 - line 22 * * column col. 4, line 12 - line 22 * * column 7 - column 12; figure 1 *;
 [A]NL1014900C  (SIERSEMA SCHEFFERS B V [NL]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 15; figure 3 * * page 1, line 1 - line 3 *
 [XAI]  - GUNNAR RYSSTAD AND JENS KOLSTAD, "Extended shelf life milk- advances in technology", vol. 59, no. 2, doi:10.1111/j.1471-0307.2006.00247.x, (20060502), pages 85 - 96, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1111/j.1471-0307.2006.00247.x/abstract, (20100823), XP002597576 [X] 1-5,8-10 * page 87, column l - page 89, column r; figures 3,5 * [A] 11-15 [I] 6,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1471-0307.2006.00247.x
 [A]  - Souci, Fachmann and Kraut, Food composition and nutritional tables, Medpharm, (2000), XP002597577 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SOUCI ET AL, Cow's milk (Whole milk, Raw milk), Cow's milk (sterilized), FOOD COMPOSITION AND NUTRITION TABLES = DIE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DER LEBENSMITTEL, NÄHRWERT-TABELLEN = LA COMPOSITION DES ALIMENTS, TABLEAUX DES VALEURS NUTRITIVES, MEDPHARM SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, STUTTGART, GERMANY, PAGE(S) 12,23, (2000), ISBN 978-3-88763-076-8, XP002574418 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9807328
 WO2006123047
    - THERMAL TECHNOLOGIES IN FOOD PROCESSING
    - KAI-PING ET AL., J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1996), vol. 44, pages 1058 - 1063
    - GILLIS ET AL., J DAIRY SCI., (1985), pages 2875 - 9
    - P. A. VAZQUEZ-LANDAVERDE ET AL., J. DAIRY SCI., (2005), vol. 88, pages 3764 - 3772
    - SINGH ET AL., LAIT, (1989), vol. 69, no. 2, pages 131 - 136
    - KULMYRZAEV ET AL., LAIT, (2002), vol. 82, pages 725 - 735
    - PIERZCHALA P.A., "A new fluorogenic substrate for plasmin", BIOCHEM. J., (1979), vol. 183, doi:doi:10.1042/bj1830555, pages 555 - 559, XP002678780

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/bj1830555
    - SAINT-DENIS T.; HUMBERT G.; GAILLARD J.L., "Enzymatic assays for native plasmin, plasminogen and plasminogen activators in bovine milk", J. DAIRY RES., (2001), vol. 68, pages 437 - 449
    - KORYCKA-DAHL M.; RIBADEAU-DUMAS B.; CHENE N.; MARTAL J., "Plasmin activity in milk", J. DAIRY SCI., (1983), vol. 66, pages 704 - 711
    - RICHARDSON B.C.; PEARCE K.N., "The determination of plasmin in dairy products", N. Z. J. DAIRY SCI. TECHNOL., (1981), vol. 16, pages 209 - 220
    - ROLLEMAH.S.; VISSER S.; POLL J.K., "Spectrophotometric assay of plasmin and plasminogen in bovine milk", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT, (1983), vol. 38, pages 214 - 217