Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784688

EP2784688 - Data center using wireless communication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.02.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/22]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shin, Ji Yong
c/o Microsoft Corporation, International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA Washington 98052 / US
02 / Kirovski, Darko
c/o Microsoft Corporation, International Patents
One Mircosoft Way
Redmond, WA Washington 98052 / US
03 / Harper III, David T.
c/o Microsoft Corporation, International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA Washington 98052 / US
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Germany LLP
IP
Rosental 4
80331 Munich / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date14173698.325.03.2011
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateUS2010075391305.04.2010         Original published format: US 753913
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2784688
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2784688
Date:22.10.2014
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784688
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/14, G06F15/16, H04L12/70, // H04W84/18
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:Datenzentrum mit drahtloser Kommunikation[2014/40]
English:Data center using wireless communication[2014/40]
French:Centre de données utilisant une communication sans fil[2014/40]
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
07.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2015Fee for grant paid
02.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11766409.4  / EP2556436
Opposition(s)18.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.03.2011
AL15.04.2015
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
BG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MK15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
SM15.04.2015
TR15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU25.03.2011
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
BG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MK15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
SM15.04.2015
TR15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2018/31]HU25.03.2011
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MK15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
SM15.04.2015
TR15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2018/29]HU25.03.2011
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MK15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
SM15.04.2015
TR15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2018/28]HU25.03.2011
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MK15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
SM15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2017/40]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/49]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/37]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/21]AT15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US6907395  (HUNT GALEN C [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7571470  (ARREGOCES MAURICIO [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1107475  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 5 *;
 [A]US2009196620  (OZEKI SHINOBU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 3 *;
 [A]WO03087887  (CRINIS NETWORKS INC [US]; MCMURRY ERIC [US]; LITTLEJOHN HARRY [US]) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 4 *;
 [A]US6795655  (SIDOROVICH VLADIMIR G [RU] ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1233551  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *