Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819018

EP2819018 - Systems and methods for evaluating onscreen keyboards [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.12.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2017Change - prioritypublished on 19.04.2017  [2017/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tata Consultancy Services Limited
Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021
Maharashtra / IN
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Chatterjee, Debatri
Tata Consultancy Services Limited
Bengal Intelligent Park
Building - D Plot No. - A2 M2 & N2 Block -EP
Salt Lake Electronics Complex, Sector -V, Kolkata - 700091
West Bengal / IN
02 / Sinharay, Arijit
Tata Consultancy Services Limited
Bengal Intelligent Park
Building - D Plot No. - A2 M2 & N2 Block -EP
Salt Lake Electronics Complex, Sector -V, Kolkata - 700091
West Bengal / IN
03 / Sinha, Aniruddha
Tata Consultancy Services Limited
Bengal Intelligent Park
Building - D Plot No. - A2 M2 & N2 Block -EP
Salt Lake Electronics Complex, Sector -V, Kolkata - 700091
West Bengal / IN
04 / Pal, Arpan
Tata Consultancy Services Limited
Bengal Intelligent Park
Building - D Plot No. - A2 M2 & N2 Block -EP
Salt Lake Electronics Complex, Sector -V, Kolkata - 700091
West Bengal / IN
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Application number, filing date14173777.524.06.2014
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateIN2013MUM213224.06.2013         Original published format: IN 2132MU2013
[2017/16]
Former [2015/01]IN2013MUM213224.06.2013
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2819018
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2819018
Date:21.01.2015
[2015/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/34, A63F13/20
[2015/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Systeme und Verfahren zur Bewertung von Bildschirmtastaturen[2015/01]
English:Systems and methods for evaluating onscreen keyboards[2015/01]
French:Systèmes et procédés d'évaluation de claviers sur écran[2015/01]
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
22.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/03]
07.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/03]
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - DEBATRI CHATTERJEE ET AL, "An Iterative Methodolgy to Improve TV Onscreen Keyboard Layout Design through Evaluation of User Studies", ADVANCES IN COMPUTING, (20121201), vol. 2, no. 5, doi:10.5923/j.ac.20120205.03, ISSN 2163-2944, pages 81 - 91, XP055158957 [X] 1-4,6-8,10,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 5,9,11-13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5923/j.ac.20120205.03
 [XP]  - SINHARAY ARIJIT ET AL, "Evaluation of Different Onscreen Keyboard Layouts Using EEG Signals", 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS, IEEE, (20131013), doi:10.1109/SMC.2013.88, pages 480 - 486, XP032557085 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SMC.2013.88
 [A]  - AVI KNOLL ET AL, Measuring Cognitive Workload with Low-Cost Electroencephalograph, HUMAN-COMPUTER INTERACTION - INTERACT 2011, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 568 - 571, (20110905), ISBN 978-3-642-23767-6, XP019163745 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SEARS A, "LAYOUT APPROPRIATENESS: A METRIC FOR EVALUATING USER INTERFACE WIDGET LAYOUT", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (19930701), vol. 19, no. 7, doi:10.1109/32.238571, ISSN 0098-5589, pages 707 - 719, XP000413273 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/32.238571