Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818487

EP2818487 - Phosphor-containing phenol formaldhyde resin and flame-retardant epoxy resin hardener containing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jiangsu Yoke Technology Co., Ltd.
Economic Development Zone
Yixing City, Jiangsu 214203 / CN
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Shen, Qi
Economic Developement Zone
214203 Yixing City / CN
02 / Li, Xu-Feng
Economic Development Zone
214203 Yixing City / CN
03 / Zhao, Dong
Economic Development Zone
214203 Yixing City / CN
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Jakelski & Althoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Mollenbachstraße 37
71229 Leonberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Jakelski & Althoff
Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Mollenbachstraße 37
71229 Leonberg / DE
Application number, filing date14173887.225.06.2014
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateCN20131025577025.06.2013         Original published format: CN201310255770
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818487
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08G8/00, C08G14/00, C08G16/00
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Phosphorhaltiges Phenolformaldhydharz und flammgeschützter Epoxidharzhärter damit[2015/01]
English:Phosphor-containing phenol formaldhyde resin and flame-retardant epoxy resin hardener containing thereof[2015/01]
French:Résine formaldhyde de phénol contenant du phosphore et durcisseur de résine époxyde ignifuge contenant celui-ci[2015/01]
Examination procedure25.06.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
15.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0142359  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2012172546  (TANG SHANG-WEI [TW] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2009215967  (LIN CHING-HSUAN [TW] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2013012668  (LIN CHING-HSUAN [TW] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2010114279  (KOLON INC [KR]; KONG JI WOONG [KR]; LEE SANG MIN [KR]; SUNG ICK KYUNG) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2013063635  (KREMS CHEMIE CHEMICAL SERVICES AG [AT]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6613848  (WANG CHUN-SHAN [TW] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0384939
 EP0384940
 EP0408990
 DE4308184
 DE4308185
 DE4308187
 WO9607685
 WO9607686