Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830001

EP2830001 - Image processing device, electronic apparatus, and glasses characteristic determination method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.12.2015
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.01.2016  [2016/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Nagao, Atsushi
c/o TRANSTRON INC.
2-15-16, Shin-Yokohama, Kouhoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date14173923.525.06.2014
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateJP2013015366924.07.2013         Original published format: JP 2013153669
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830001
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G01M11/02, H04N13/00
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung, elektronische Vorrichtung und Brilleneigenschaftsbestimmungsverfahren[2015/05]
English:Image processing device, electronic apparatus, and glasses characteristic determination method[2015/05]
French:Dispositif de traitement d'image, appareil électronique et procédé de détermination de caractéristique de lunettes[2015/05]
Examination procedure25.06.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
29.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/03]
04.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/03]
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP2608109  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0020] * [Y] 2,6,7;
 [Y]US2011157180  (BURGER DOUGLAS CHRISTOPHER [US] ET AL) [Y] 2,6,7 * paragraph [0052]; figure 11 *;
 [Y]WO2011156721  (BACK IN FOCUS [FR]; MARCHAND PIERRE [FR]; PITE ERIC [US]; GUILLEMET HE) [Y] 2,6,7 * paragraph [0077] *;
 [Y]EP1901564  (NTT DATA SANYO SYSTEM CORP [JP]; TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,6,7 * paragraph [0031]; figure 2 *
by applicantJP2007010924
 JP2006318374